There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend through December 31, 2007, the authority of the Secretary of the Army to accept and expend funds contributed by non-Federal public entities to expedite the processing of permits.

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Amended by Senate

A bill to extend through March 31, 2006, the authority of the Secretary of the Army to accept and expend funds contributed by non-Federal public entities and to expedite the processing of permits".


Actions Overview (8)

Date
11/11/2005Became Public Law No: 109-99. (TXT | PDF)
11/11/2005Signed by President.
11/01/2005Presented to President.
10/18/2005Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
10/07/2005Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
10/07/2005Senate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/20/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8115)
09/14/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
11/11/2005Became Public Law No: 109-99. (TXT | PDF)
11/11/2005Signed by President.
11/01/2005HousePresented to President.
10/18/2005-1:45pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/18/2005-1:45pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote.
10/18/2005-1:41pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3765.
10/18/2005-1:40pmHouseMr. Duncan moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H8873-8874)
10/07/2005SenatePassed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent.
10/07/2005SenateS.Amdt.2058 Amendment SA 2058 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/07/2005SenateS.Amdt.2058 Amendment SA 2058 proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Inhofe. (consideration: CR S11332; text: CR S11332) To amend the title.
10/07/2005SenateS.Amdt.2057 Amendment SA 2057 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/07/2005SenateS.Amdt.2057 Amendment SA 2057 proposed by Senator Stevens for Senator Inhofe. (consideration: CR S11332; text: CR S11332) To modify the reauthorization period of a certain water resource program.
10/07/2005SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S11332)
10/07/2005SenateSenate Committee on Environment and Public Works discharged by Unanimous Consent.
09/27/2005SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
09/21/2005SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/20/2005-3:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/20/2005-3:23pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8115)
09/20/2005-3:14pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3765.
09/20/2005-3:14pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8115-8116)
09/20/2005-3:13pmHouseMr. Boustany moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
09/15/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
09/14/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
09/14/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (8)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure09/14/2005 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment09/15/2005 Referred to
Senate Environment and Public Works09/27/2005 Referred to
10/07/2005 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for H.R.3765. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-99 (11/11/2005)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on October 7, 2005. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Amends the Water Resources Development Act of 2000 to extend through March 31, 2006, the authority of the Secretary of the Army to accept and expend funds contributed by non-federal public entities to expedite the evaluation of permits under the jurisdiction of the Department of the Army.