Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/01/2005
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/01/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/01/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 02/01/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/01/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/01/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 02/01/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/01/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/14/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 02/14/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/14/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/14/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/14/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 02/14/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/14/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/14/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 02/14/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/14/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 02/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 02/14/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/14/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/14/2005
Rep. Chocola, Chris [R-IN-2] 02/14/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/14/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/14/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/08/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/08/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/14/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/21/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/21/2005