Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/15/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/15/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/15/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/15/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/20/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/20/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/20/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/20/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/21/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/21/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/21/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/21/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/21/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/21/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/27/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/27/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/27/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/27/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 09/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/07/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/07/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/07/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/19/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/19/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/03/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/10/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/16/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 12/06/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/01/2006