Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/15/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/15/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/29/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/07/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/07/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 10/07/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/19/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/06/2006