Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/14/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/14/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 10/25/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/25/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/16/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/01/2006
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/08/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/08/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/16/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/16/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/16/2006
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/16/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/16/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/04/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/06/2006