Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/20/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 10/07/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/07/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/16/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 05/18/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/23/2006