Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/22/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 09/22/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/22/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/29/2005
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/06/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 10/06/2005