Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 09/20/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 09/20/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/22/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/22/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/22/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/22/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 09/22/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/22/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/27/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/27/2005
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/27/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 09/27/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 09/27/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 09/27/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/27/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/27/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/27/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/28/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/28/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/28/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/28/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/28/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/29/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 10/06/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/06/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/18/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/07/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 12/13/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 12/13/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/09/2006