Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/29/2006
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/29/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/29/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/05/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/05/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/26/2006
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/26/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/26/2006
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/07/2006