Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8]* 09/21/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/21/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/21/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/21/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 10/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 11/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/07/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/07/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 11/07/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/15/2006
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 06/20/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/13/2006
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/19/2006
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 07/19/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/25/2006
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/27/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 09/12/2006
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/12/2006
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/14/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/29/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/29/2006
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/15/2006