Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 09/29/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 09/29/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/29/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 09/29/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/03/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/03/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/03/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/03/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/03/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/03/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/03/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/03/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/03/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/03/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/07/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/07/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/07/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/07/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/19/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/19/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/19/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 10/19/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/19/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 10/19/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 10/25/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/25/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 10/25/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 10/25/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/02/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/02/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 11/04/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/10/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10] 11/10/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/10/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 11/10/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 11/18/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 12/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/16/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 01/03/2006
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/31/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/08/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/08/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/15/2006
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 02/15/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/09/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/14/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/30/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/30/2006
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/30/2006
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/25/2006
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 04/25/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/25/2006
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/26/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/26/2006
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/02/2006
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/02/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/02/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/09/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/09/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/17/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/17/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/18/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/18/2006