Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/27/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 09/29/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 10/07/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/07/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/18/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/20/2005