Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/22/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 11/09/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 11/09/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 12/15/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/16/2006
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 02/16/2006
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/16/2006
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 02/16/2006
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/06/2006
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 04/06/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/06/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/06/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/03/2006
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/03/2006
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 05/03/2006
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-45] 05/03/2006
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 05/18/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/18/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/24/2006
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 05/24/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/24/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/12/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/12/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/12/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/12/2006
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 06/12/2006
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/12/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/11/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/11/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/11/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/11/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/18/2006
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 07/18/2006
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/27/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 09/20/2006
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 09/20/2006
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/20/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/27/2006
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/27/2006
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 09/28/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/28/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew