Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/27/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50] 10/28/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/06/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/06/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 12/13/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/08/2006