Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/27/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/27/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 09/27/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/29/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 09/29/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/06/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/06/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/06/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/06/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/01/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/01/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 12/13/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 12/13/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/15/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/28/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/03/2006