Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Osborne, Tom [R-NE-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/22/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7]* 09/22/2005
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/22/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/27/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/27/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/27/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 09/27/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/27/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/27/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 09/27/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/29/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/29/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/29/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 10/06/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/06/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 10/19/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/24/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/02/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 11/02/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 11/08/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/08/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/08/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/14/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 11/15/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 11/17/2005