Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/01/2005
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/01/2005
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/01/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/01/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 02/01/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/08/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/08/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 02/08/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/15/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/15/2005
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 02/16/2005
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 02/16/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/17/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/01/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/01/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/01/2005
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/01/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 03/01/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/01/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/01/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/01/2005
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/01/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20] 03/01/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/01/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/01/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/02/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/02/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/02/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/02/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 03/08/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/08/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/09/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/09/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 03/09/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/14/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/05/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/05/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/05/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/14/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/19/2005
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 04/20/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/28/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 05/03/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/03/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/05/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/10/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/11/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/23/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/25/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/11/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/21/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/07/2005
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 11/01/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/08/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/17/2005
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 12/07/2005
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 12/07/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/08/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 12/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 12/13/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 02/07/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 02/07/2006
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/04/2006
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 05/11/2006
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/07/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/13/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/06/2006
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/19/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/26/2006