Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/29/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/29/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/06/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/06/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/18/2005