There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Hurricanes Katrina and Rita Flood Insurance Buy-In Act of 2005

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To strengthen the national flood insurance program, encourage participation in the program, and provide owners of properties not located in flood hazard zones that, therefore, were not subject to the mandatory purchase requirements of the national flood insurance program, but which suffered flood damage resulting from Hurricane Katrina or Hurricane Rita and were covered by windstorm insurance, a one-time opportunity to purchase flood insurance coverage for a period covering such hurricane.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
09/27/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (5)

Date
06/22/2006Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H4502-4503)
Action By: House of Representatives
01/04/2006Referred to the Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity.
Action By: Committee on Financial Services
12/08/2005Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H11242)
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/2005Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Action By: House of Representatives
09/27/2005Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (78)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/27/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/20/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/07/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/07/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/07/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/07/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/07/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/09/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/09/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/09/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/09/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/09/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/09/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/09/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/09/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/14/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/14/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/14/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/14/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/14/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/18/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/18/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/18/2005

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services09/27/2005 Referred to
House Financial Services Subcommittee on Housing and Community Opportunity01/04/2006 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.3922. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (09/27/2005)

Hurricanes Katrina and Rita Flood Insurance Buy-In Act of 2005 - Establishes a temporary flood insurance buy-in program. Instructs the Director of the Federal Emergency Management Agency to make flood insurance coverage available under such program for eligible structures (but not their contents) for flooding resulting from Hurricane Katrina or Hurricane Rita. Limits eligibility to structures located in an area not subject to the mandatory purchase requirements of the national flood insurance program, and which were not covered by such insurance at the time of the hurricanes. Prescribes a formula for determination of premiums, which may be paid by deduction from the amount of any claims payable under coverage by the buy-in program.