Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 09/27/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 09/27/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 10/06/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/06/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/20/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/20/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/07/2005
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 11/07/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 11/07/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/07/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/07/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/07/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/09/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 11/09/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 11/09/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/09/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 11/09/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/09/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/09/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/09/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/09/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/09/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/14/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/14/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/14/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/14/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/14/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/14/2005
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/14/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 11/14/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/18/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 12/18/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 12/18/2005