Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 09/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 09/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 09/28/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/28/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/28/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 09/29/2005
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-5] 09/29/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/06/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/06/2005
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 10/19/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/19/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 10/19/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/01/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/03/2005
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/03/2005
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 11/10/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 12/07/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 12/07/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 12/14/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 12/14/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 12/14/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 12/14/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/14/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/14/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 12/15/2005
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 12/15/2005
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 12/15/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 12/16/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 12/16/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 12/16/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 12/16/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 12/16/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/16/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/16/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/31/2006
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/01/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/28/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/07/2006
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 09/13/2006
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 09/21/2006
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/27/2006