Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 09/28/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 09/28/2005
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 09/28/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 09/28/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 09/28/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/07/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/17/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 10/17/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/17/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/17/2005
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/17/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/17/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/17/2005
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/17/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/17/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 10/17/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/17/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 10/17/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/31/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 11/04/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/04/2005
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 11/04/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/04/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/04/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/04/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/04/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/04/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/04/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 12/16/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 12/22/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 03/09/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/25/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/25/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/25/2006
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/25/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/25/2006
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 04/25/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/25/2006
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/27/2006
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/27/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/27/2006
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/27/2006
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/27/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 04/27/2006
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 04/27/2006
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/27/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/27/2006
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 04/27/2006
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/27/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/27/2006
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/27/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/27/2006
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 04/27/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/27/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/27/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/03/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/03/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/03/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/03/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/03/2006
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/16/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/16/2006
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 06/12/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/12/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/12/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/12/2006
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/20/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/12/2006