Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/29/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9]* 09/29/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/07/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 10/07/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 10/07/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 10/07/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 10/07/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 10/07/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/07/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 10/07/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 10/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 10/07/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/07/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/07/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/07/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/19/2005
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/19/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 10/19/2005
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 10/19/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9] 10/25/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/25/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/25/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 10/25/2005
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 10/25/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/03/2005