Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/07/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/25/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/25/2005
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/26/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/26/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/17/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/17/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/17/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 11/17/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 12/07/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2006
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/21/2006