Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/02/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/02/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/07/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/27/2006
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 04/27/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/27/2006
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/02/2006
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/02/2006
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/02/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/02/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/10/2006
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/23/2006