Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 09/29/2005
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/20/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/28/2005
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/08/2006