Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 10/18/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/16/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 12/16/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/06/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/06/2006