Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/01/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 11/01/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/07/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/08/2005
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 12/13/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/01/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/08/2006