Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/01/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/01/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 02/01/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 02/01/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/01/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/01/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/01/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/01/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/01/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 02/01/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/01/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/01/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 02/01/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/01/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 02/01/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/19/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 05/19/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/19/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/19/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/19/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/19/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/19/2005
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/09/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/11/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/18/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/13/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/13/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/13/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/13/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 09/13/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 09/13/2005
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/13/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/13/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/13/2005
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 09/13/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/13/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/13/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 09/13/2005
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/13/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/13/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 09/13/2005
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/13/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 09/13/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/13/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/13/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/13/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 09/27/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/27/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 10/27/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/01/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/01/2006
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 02/01/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/08/2006
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/08/2006
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 02/08/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/14/2006
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/15/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/09/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 09/26/2006