Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/06/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/01/2005
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 11/08/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/07/2006
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/08/2006
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/09/2006