Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/04/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/04/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/08/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/08/2005
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/08/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/15/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/15/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/01/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/06/2005
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/29/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 01/31/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/15/2006
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 12/08/2006