Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-22]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 10/20/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/20/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/01/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/02/2005
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 11/07/2005
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 12/13/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 12/15/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/16/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 01/31/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/31/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/07/2006
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/28/2006