Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 10/07/2005
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/19/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/19/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/19/2005
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/19/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/19/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/19/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 10/19/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 10/19/2005
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/19/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/19/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/19/2005
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 10/19/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/19/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/19/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 10/19/2005
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 10/19/2005
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/19/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/10/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/10/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/10/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 02/08/2006
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/08/2006
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/28/2006
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/28/2006
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/28/2006
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 02/28/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/28/2006
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/28/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/28/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/28/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/28/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/28/2006
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/28/2006
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/28/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/28/2006
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 02/28/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/28/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/22/2006
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/22/2006
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/22/2006
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/22/2006
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/22/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/22/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/21/2006
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/21/2006
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/21/2006
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/21/2006