Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/17/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 10/17/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 10/17/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/17/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 10/17/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 10/17/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 10/18/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/18/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/18/2005
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 10/27/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/27/2005
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/27/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/27/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 10/27/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/27/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/27/2005
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/27/2005
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 10/27/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/27/2005
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/27/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/02/2005
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/02/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 11/02/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/02/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/15/2005
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/15/2005
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/15/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/15/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 11/15/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/15/2005
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 11/17/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/17/2005
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 12/06/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/06/2005
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 12/06/2005
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 12/06/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/14/2005
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/14/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 12/14/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/15/2005
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 12/16/2005
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/07/2006
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/28/2006
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/28/2006
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/28/2006
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/28/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/28/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/28/2006
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 03/30/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/04/2006
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/25/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/25/2006
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/25/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/25/2006
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/02/2006
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/02/2006
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/02/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 05/02/2006
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 05/23/2006
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/06/2006
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 06/06/2006
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/09/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/14/2006