Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/18/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/20/2005
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/20/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 10/20/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 10/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/26/2005
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 10/26/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 10/28/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/03/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 11/03/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/03/2005
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 11/03/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/03/2005
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 11/03/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/08/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/08/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/08/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/08/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/15/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/15/2005
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/15/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/15/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/15/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 11/15/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 11/15/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/15/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 12/06/2005