Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 10/18/2005
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 10/18/2005
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large] 10/18/2005
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/20/2005
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 10/25/2005
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 10/26/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 10/28/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 11/04/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush D. [D-NJ-12] 11/16/2005
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 12/06/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 12/07/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 06/19/2006
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/20/2006
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/20/2006
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/20/2006