Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Case, Ed [D-HI-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/19/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 11/03/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 11/09/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 11/09/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/09/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 11/09/2005
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 11/15/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/16/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/17/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 12/06/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 12/08/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 12/08/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/08/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/08/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 12/08/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 12/14/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 12/16/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/31/2006
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/06/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/25/2006
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/25/2006
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 04/25/2006
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/25/2006