Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Beauprez, Bob [R-CO-7]* 10/07/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 10/07/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 10/07/2005
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 10/28/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 10/28/2005
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-1] 02/15/2006
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/11/2006
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 06/08/2006
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 09/14/2006