Refine your search

Showing 7 of 7 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
03/20/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-199.
03/20/2006 Signed by President.
03/10/2006 Presented to President.
03/03/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S1756)
12/16/2005 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
11/08/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H9981)
10/07/2005 Introduced in House