Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/18/2005
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/18/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/18/2005
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 10/18/2005
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/18/2005
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 10/18/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/18/2005
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/25/2005
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/25/2005
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 10/25/2005
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/26/2005
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 10/26/2005
Rep. Sodrel, Michael E. [R-IN-9] 10/26/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 10/28/2005
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 10/28/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 10/28/2005
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 10/28/2005
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/28/2005
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/28/2005
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 10/28/2005
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/28/2005
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F.H. [D-AS-At Large] 10/28/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 10/28/2005
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 10/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/03/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/03/2005
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/18/2005
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/18/2005
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 11/18/2005
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/18/2005
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/07/2006