Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-50]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Otter, C. L. (Butch) [R-ID-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 02/01/2005
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/01/2005
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/08/2005
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/08/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 02/08/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 02/09/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/01/2005
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/01/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/08/2005
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/06/2005
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/12/2005
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/20/2005
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/20/2005
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 04/21/2005
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/24/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5] 05/24/2005
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/15/2005
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/16/2005
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/16/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/16/2005
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/22/2005
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/22/2005
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/13/2005
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 07/25/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/15/2005
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/14/2006
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/28/2006
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/09/2006
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/11/2006
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/16/2006
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/12/2006
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/19/2006