Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-5]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-9]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-10]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/19/2005
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 10/19/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/03/2005
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 11/03/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 11/03/2005
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/03/2005
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 11/03/2005
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 11/03/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 11/03/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/17/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 11/17/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 11/17/2005
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 11/18/2005
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 12/15/2005
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/22/2006