There are 7 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Sierra National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2006

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Sierra National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2005

Short Titles as Introduced

Sierra National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2005

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Sierra National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2006

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Sierra National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2006

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide for the exchange of land within the Sierra National Forest, California, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
12/01/2006Became Public Law No: 109-375. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/2006Signed by President.
11/21/2006Presented to President.
11/13/2006Resolving differences -- House actions: On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote.(text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8582)
09/29/2006Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
04/20/2006Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 04/07/2006 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 109-243.
09/20/2005Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H8117-8118)
01/26/2005Introduced in House

All Actions (27)

Date Chamber
12/01/2006Became Public Law No: 109-375. (TXT | PDF)
12/01/2006Signed by President.
11/21/2006HousePresented to President.
11/13/2006-2:12pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/13/2006-2:12pmHouseOn motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H8582)
11/13/2006-2:09pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 409.
11/13/2006-2:09pmHouseMr. Radanovich moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H8582-8583)
09/29/2006SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/29/2006SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2006SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2006SenateS.Amdt.5112 Amendment SA 5112 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2006SenateS.Amdt.5111 Amendment SA 5111 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/29/2006SenateS.Amdt.5112 Amendment SA 5112 proposed by Senator Hutchison for Senator Domenici. To provide appropriation authorization for grants to improve the commercial value of forest biomass for electric energy, useful heat, transportation fuels, and other commercial purposes.
09/29/2006SenateS.Amdt.5111 Amendment SA 5111 proposed by Senator Hutchison for Senator Domenici. (consideration: CR S10536; text: CR S10536) To modify the section relating to the grant of an easement and right of first refusal to the owner of Project No. 67.
09/29/2006SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S10536; text of measure as reported in Senate: CR S10536)
04/20/2006SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 405.
04/20/2006SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Domenici under authority of the order of the Senate of 04/07/2006 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 109-243.
03/08/2006SenateCommittee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
09/21/2005SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
09/20/2005-3:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/20/2005-3:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8117-8118)
09/20/2005-3:31pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 409.
09/20/2005-3:31pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8117-8118)
09/20/2005-3:30pmHouseMr. Renzi moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
02/11/2005HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
01/26/2005HouseReferred to the House Committee on Resources.
01/26/2005HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/26/2005

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources01/26/2005 Referred to
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health02/11/2005 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources09/21/2005 Referred to
03/08/2006 Markup by
04/20/2006 Reported by S. Rept. 109-243

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (20)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.409. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 109-375 (12/01/2006)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the Senate on September 29, 2006. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Sierra National Forest Land Exchange Act of 2006 - Directs the Secretary of Agriculture to convey specified federal land in Mt. Diablo Meridian, California, in exchange for certain non-federal land in Mt. Diablo Meridian and a payment of $50,000, if the owner of such land offers to make such exchange during the year following enactment of this Act.

Requires that the recipient of the federal land convey all 160 acres of such land to the Sequoia Council of the Boy Scouts of America within 120 days after the date on which the recipient receives title to that land.

Directs the Secretary to: (1) manage the non-federal land received in accordance with the Weeks Act and any other laws, including regulations, applicable to the National Forest System; and (2) deposit the cash payment received into the fund established by the Sisk Act, to be expended for the acquisition of lands and interests in lands for the National Forest System in California.

Requires that the owner of the non-federal land pay to the Secretary all direct costs associated with processing the land exchange. Requires any such amounts received by the Secretary to be deposited in a cost collection account to be expended for the costs associated with the land exchange. Provides for the refund of any amounts remaining in such account after completion of the land exchange that are not needed to cover the expenses of such exchange.

Considers the boundaries of the Sierra National Forest to be its boundaries as of January 1, 1965.

States that, in accordance with a specified agreement entered into by the Forest Service, the Council, and the owner of the hydroelectric Project No. 67 and executed on April 17, 2006: (1) the Secretary shall grant an easement to the owner of Project No. 67; and (2) the Council shall grant a right of first refusal to that owner.

Requires the Council to provide to the owner of the project, under such terms and conditions as are agreed to by the Council and such owner, a right of first refusal to obtain the federal land, or a portion of such land, that the Council proposes to sell, transfer, or otherwise convey.

Instructs the Secretary, in exercising any discretion necessary to carry out this Act, to ensure that the public interest is well served.

Amends the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to decrease the amount provided for carrying out the Biomass Commercial Use Grant Program and the Improved Biomass Use Grant Program for FY2007-FY2016.