Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 10/20/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 10/20/2005
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 10/20/2005
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 10/20/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Harris, Katherine [R-FL-13] 11/04/2005
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 11/04/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 11/04/2005
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/04/2005
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/04/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 11/18/2005
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 12/06/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 12/07/2005