Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 10/20/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/31/2005
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/31/2005
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 10/31/2005
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/03/2005
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 11/04/2005
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 11/09/2005
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 11/09/2005
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 11/09/2005
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/09/2005
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 11/09/2005
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/09/2005
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-8] 11/09/2005
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 11/10/2005
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 11/10/2005
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 11/10/2005
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 11/10/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 11/16/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 11/17/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/07/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew