Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
08/01/2006 Became Public Law No: 109-257.
08/01/2006 Signed by President.
07/26/2006 Presented to President.
07/20/2006 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S8092)
06/22/2006 Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Collins without amendment. Without written report.
12/19/2005 Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H12212-12213)
12/19/2005 Committee on Government Reform discharged.
10/20/2005 Introduced in House