Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-20]* 10/25/2005
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 11/07/2005
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/18/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 11/18/2005
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 12/06/2005
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 12/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/08/2006