Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Young, C.W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 02/16/2005
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 02/16/2005
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 02/16/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/16/2005
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/16/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/16/2005
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 02/16/2005
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 02/16/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/16/2005
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 02/16/2005
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/16/2005
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/01/2005
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/15/2005
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/15/2005
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/06/2005
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/06/2005
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 04/06/2005
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/21/2005
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/21/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/04/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/04/2005
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/26/2005
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/26/2005
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/26/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/26/2005
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/26/2005
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/26/2005
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/26/2005
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/14/2005
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/14/2005
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 07/12/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/12/2005
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kennedy, Mark R. [R-MN-6] 07/12/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/28/2005
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/28/2005
Rep. Simmons, Rob [R-CT-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/28/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 09/13/2005
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/13/2005
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 09/13/2005
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 09/13/2005
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 09/13/2005
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 09/13/2005
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 10/18/2005
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/18/2005
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/18/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 11/08/2005
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 11/08/2005
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/16/2005
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/16/2005
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 12/14/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 12/14/2005
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 12/14/2005
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 12/14/2005
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 12/14/2005
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/14/2005
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/14/2006
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/14/2006
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/15/2006
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/15/2006
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/26/2006
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/26/2006
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/26/2006
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 04/26/2006
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/26/2006
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/11/2006
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/11/2006
Rep. Hart, Melissa A. [R-PA-4] 05/11/2006
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 05/11/2006
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/15/2006
Rep. Schwarz, John J.H. "Joe" [R-MI-7] 06/15/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 07/25/2006
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/12/2006
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/12/2006
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 12/08/2006
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 12/08/2006