Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/01/2006
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/01/2006
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/01/2006
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/01/2006
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/01/2006
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/01/2006
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/01/2006
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 02/01/2006
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/01/2006
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/01/2006
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/14/2006
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 02/14/2006
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/14/2006
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/14/2006
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 02/14/2006
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/14/2006
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/08/2006
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/08/2006
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 03/08/2006
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/08/2006
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/08/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/08/2006
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/09/2006
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/09/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/16/2006
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 03/16/2006
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/29/2006
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/04/2006
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/04/2006
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/04/2006
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/04/2006
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/14/2006
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/14/2006
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/29/2006