Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/26/2005
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 02/17/2005
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/17/2005
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/17/2005
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/01/2005
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/01/2005
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-2] 03/15/2005
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/15/2005
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 04/06/2005
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/06/2005
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/06/2005
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/21/2005
Rep. Bradley, Jeb [R-NH-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/21/2005
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 04/21/2005
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/21/2005
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/26/2005
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/26/2005
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/26/2005
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/26/2005
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/14/2005
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/14/2005
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/14/2005
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/12/2005
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/12/2005
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/12/2005
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/12/2005
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/13/2005
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/18/2005
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/16/2005
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 11/16/2005
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 12/14/2005
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 12/14/2005
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/14/2006
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/26/2006
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-24] 04/26/2006
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/26/2006
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/07/2006
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/07/2006
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/25/2006
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 07/25/2006

Show cosponsors who withdrew